HI HCR239 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Facilitate The Deployment Of Renewable-energy Technologies, Including Waste-to-energy, In Hawaii And To Attract Foreign Direct Investment And International Trade From The Republic Of Korea.
Title
Republic of Korea; Renewable Energy Technologies
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from ENE/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kouchi, Solomon ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to ENE/TIA, WAM. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 413). |
2013-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1403), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-01 | House | Re-referred to EEP, referral sheet 46 |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Evans, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Fale; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Hanohano. |
2013-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-28-13 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to EEP, VMI, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR173 (Same As) 2013-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=239&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR239_.HTM |