HI HCR231 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Department Of Health To Conduct A Joint Study Of The Short-term And Long-term Effects Of Chlorpyrifos On Farmworkers.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Department Of Health To Conduct A Joint Study Of The Short-term And Long-term Effects Of Chlorpyrifos On Farmworkers.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from EEP/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1542-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Ing. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Yamane. |
2018-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:35AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR201 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=231&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR231_.HTM |