HI HCR23 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Lahaina, Maui, For Maintenance And Repair Of Existing Deck And Improvements.
Title
Submerged State Lands; Lahaina, Maui; Non-Exclusive Easement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 771). | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) One Day Notice 04-20-12. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Waived referral to WLH, WAM. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 560). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1707-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Chang excused (2). | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 967-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Kawakami, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Nakashima, Riviere. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 03-02-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Offered | |
2012-01-23 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR16 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.