HI HCR212 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to EGH/ENE/WAM.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to EGH/ENE/WAM.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The High Technology Development Corporation To Establish A Hydrogen Fueling Station Demonstration Project.
Title
Hydrogen Fueling Stations; High Technology Development Corporation; Clean Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to EGH/ENE/WAM. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 647). |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-11 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1623), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2013-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 04-02-13 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to EDB, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=212&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR212_.HTM |