HI HCR207 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting An Audit Of All State Departments And Agencies Utilizing State Funds For Outside Counsel.
Title
State Departments and Agencies; Use of State Funds for Outside Counsel; Audit
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1265), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, C. Lee, Woodson. |
2015-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR143 (Same As) 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=207&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR207_.HTM |