HI HCR203 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Efforts Of The Kauai Beekeepers Association And Other Key Stakeholders For Their Efforts To Assist The Department Of Agriculture With Education And Prevention Of The Varroa Mite And Other Invasive Species.
Title
Kauai Bee Keepers Association
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 278). | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Wooley, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Takai, Tokioka, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Wakai. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-19-10 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Referred to AGR, referral sheet 45 | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-08 | (H) To be offered. |