HI HCR200 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to HHS.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to HHS.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Report On The Cultural And Therapeutic Services Provided By Community-based Organizations At The Kawailoa Youth And Family Wellness Center.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Report On The Cultural And Therapeutic Services Provided By Community-based Organizations At The Kawailoa Youth And Family Wellness Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to HHS. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 643). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1672-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3). |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1369-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR180 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Community-Based Organizations
Department of Health and Human Services
Homeless Youth
Incarcerated Youth
Kawailoa Youth and Family Wellness
Mental Health
Report
Department of Health and Human Services
Homeless Youth
Incarcerated Youth
Kawailoa Youth and Family Wellness
Mental Health
Report