HI HCR194 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Convene A Working Group To Examine The Feasibility Of Establishing A Statewide Electronic Reporting System For Pawn Shops.
Title
Pawnbrokers; Electronic Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1308-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2014-03-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-17-14. |
2014-03-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Har, Yamane. |
2014-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled for reconsideration of previous decision by CPC/JUD on 03-24-14 2:45PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Nakashima, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, C. Lee, Wooley. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, Har, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, C. Lee, Yamane. |
2014-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 03-17-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR154 (Same As) 2014-03-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).