HI HCR19 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to WTL/PSM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to WTL/PSM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Work With The United States Fish And Wildlife Service To Implement A Native Plant Seeding Project In Mililani Mauka To Restore The Ecological Damage From The November 2023 Wildfires.
Title
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Work With The United States Fish And Wildlife Service To Implement A Native Plant Seeding Project In Mililani Mauka To Restore The Ecological Damage From The November 2023 Wildfires.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 486). |
2024-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan excused (2). |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1564-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 17 |
2024-02-13 | House | Offered |
2024-02-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR9 (Same As) 2024-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Mililani Mauka
Native Plants
United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Wildfire Prevention
Mililani Mauka
Native Plants
United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Wildfire Prevention