HI HCR19 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR19
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Amend Its Mission Statement To Expressly Include The Development Of A Business Friendly Culture In The State.
Title
Urging The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Amend Its Mission Statement To Expressly Include The Development Of A Business Friendly Culture In The State.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Lei Learmont [D] |
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2018-02-05 | House | Offered |
2018-02-02 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR19 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Souki, Thielen excused (7).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=19&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR19_.HTM |