HI HCR186 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - The committee(s) on HHS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-17-24 8:45AM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - The committee(s) on HHS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-17-24 8:45AM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor, Department Of Human Services, And Department Of Health To Explore Avenues To Ensure Continued Access To Affordable Medications For The State's Underserved Populations Under The 340b Drug Pricing Program And Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation And Relevant Federal Agencies To Monitor Pharmaceutical Companies And Take Appropriate Actions To Protect The Integrity Of The 340b Drug Pricing Program.
Title
Urging The Governor, Department Of Human Services, And Department Of Health To Explore Avenues To Ensure Continued Access To Affordable Medications For The State's Underserved Populations Under The 340b Drug Pricing Program And Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation And Relevant Federal Agencies To Monitor Pharmaceutical Companies And Take Appropriate Actions To Protect The Integrity Of The 340b Drug Pricing Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-17-24 8:45AM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-24 8:45AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to HHS. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 637). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1642-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1534-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-27 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Nishimoto. |
2024-03-20 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-24 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-24 at 11:15 AM. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR166 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
340B Drug Pricing Program
Access to Affordable Pharmaceuticals
DHS
DOH
Governor
Hawaii Congressional Delegation
Health Resources and Services Administration
Access to Affordable Pharmaceuticals
DHS
DOH
Governor
Hawaii Congressional Delegation
Health Resources and Services Administration