HI HCR186 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on OMH as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on OMH as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of Prohibiting Smoking On All Of Hawaii's Beaches.
Title
Smoking on Beaches; Prohibition
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on OMH as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (4). |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1099-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to OMH. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Jordan, Oshiro. |
2014-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-19-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR147 (Same As) 2014-03-12 - Referred to HLT, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 33