HI HCR184 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to GVO/HEA, JDL.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to GVO/HEA, JDL.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii, West Oahu, To Collaborate With The State Procurement Office To Explore, Collect Data, And Report On The Viability Of A Workforce Development Pilot Program In The Field Of Procurement.
Title
University of Hawaii, West Oahu; State Procurement Office
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HEA, JDL. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 460). |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | House managers reconsidered previous decision. |
2016-04-07 | House | Re-referred to EDB, referral sheet 45 |
2016-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro, Saiki excused (6). |
2016-03-28 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1346-16), recommending referral to HED. |
2016-03-17 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2016-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Thursday, 03-17-16 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to EDB, HED, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR131 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=184&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR184_.HTM |