HI HCR173 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to PSM/HTH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to PSM/HTH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Public Safety To Expand Community Drug Treatment And Mental Health Programs For Nonviolent Offenders And Move Low-risk Offenders Into Community Programs That Directly Address Their Pathways To Incarceration.
Title
Community Drug Treatment Programs; Mental Health Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HTH/WAM. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 644). |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-11 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1633), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, McDermott. |
2013-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-05-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1335), recommending referral to JUD. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Takumi, McDermott. |
2013-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-28-13 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=173&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR173_.HTM |