HI HCR17 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health Developmental Disabilities Division To Establish A Task Force To Review Hawaii's Statutory Definition Of "developmental Disabilities".
Title
DOH Developmental Disabilities Division; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-16 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-16 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Wooley excused (2). |
2014-04-16 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2014-04-02 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 428) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-14. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3171) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-14 1:40PM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387). |
2014-03-14 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-03-14 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 979-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2014-03-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro, Woodson. |
2014-03-05 | House | Resolution scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-07-14 9:35AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-05 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-07-14 at 9:35AM. |
2014-03-03 | House | Resolution scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-05-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-14 at 8:30AM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-26-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 9 |
2014-01-23 | House | Offered |
2014-01-21 | House | To be offered. |