HI HCR166 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HMS/HRE/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HMS/HRE/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii And Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Conduct A Review, By County, Of The State's Workforce Requirements For Professional And Paraprofessional Elder Care Partners For The Next Decade In Order To Address The Need For Care Of Hawaii's Rapidly Growing Elderly Population.
Title
Kupuna; Professional and Paraprofessional Workforce; University of Hawaii
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HRE/JDL, WAM. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 480). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1319-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | Re-referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 38 |
2014-03-18 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-18-14 9:45AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to HUS, HED, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR126 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR124 (Same As) 2014-03-13 - Referred to HMS/HRE/JDL, WAM.
SCR124 (Same As) 2014-03-13 - Referred to HMS/HRE/JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=166&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR166_.HTM |