HI HCR163 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing A Pilot Program For The Creation Of Urban Art On State-owned Property Under The Direction Of The Hawaii State Foundation On Culture And The Arts.
Title
Graffiti; Hawaii State Foundation on Culture and the Arts; pilot program; Urban Art
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1615), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 384). |
2013-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1270), recommending adoption. |
2013-03-25 | House | Re-referred to WAL, referral sheet 44 |
2013-03-25 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Kawakami; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Coffman; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-25-13 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to WAL, VMI, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR131 (Same As) 2013-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.