HI HCR160 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR160
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating The Ties Between Hawaii And The Freely Associated States And Urging The President Of The United States And United States Congress To Appoint A Lead Negotiator To Revitalize And Finalize The Stalled Renegotiation Of The Compacts Of Free Association Prior To The Compacts' Expiration.
Title
Celebrating The Ties Between Hawaii And The Freely Associated States And Urging The President Of The United States And United States Congress To Appoint A Lead Negotiator To Revitalize And Finalize The Stalled Renegotiation Of The Compacts Of Free Association Prior To The Compacts' Expiration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4). |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1517-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:40AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR160 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
HCR160 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 25
HCR160 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 25