HI HCR155 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to EGH/AGL.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to EGH/AGL.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Agriculture To Collaborate With The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Create Economic Development Initiatives For The Perpetuation And Use Of Native Hawaiian Plants And Resources.
Title
Native Hawaiian Plants; Department of Agriculture; DBEDT; Economic Development Initiatives; Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to EGH/AGL. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 412). |
2014-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Hashem excused (2). |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1373-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Ohno. |
2014-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-28-14 11:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on EDB as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1289-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to EDB. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-19 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-19-14 9:45AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to OMH, EDB, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR116 (Same As) 2014-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.