HI HCR140 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Office Of Planning And Sustainable Development To Develop A Scope Of Work Or Requests For Proposals For Bidders To Perform Their Own Analysis And Methodology That Determines Whether A Development Will Contribute To The Long-term Fiscal Sustainability Of The State And Respective County.
Title
Urging The Office Of Planning And Sustainable Development To Develop A Scope Of Work Or Requests For Proposals For Bidders To Perform Their Own Analysis And Methodology That Determines Whether A Development Will Contribute To The Long-term Fiscal Sustainability Of The State And Respective County.
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Andrew Garrett [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Tyson Miyake [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2024-04-26 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-26 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Quinlan excused (2). |
2024-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-25 | House | One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-26-24. |
2024-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 716) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-19-24. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3873) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-08-24 1:45PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HOU. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 482). |
2024-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-28 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1553-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, M. Mizuno, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Hashem, Takayama, Souza. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Onishi. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Wednesday, 03-20-24 9:05AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR121 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.