HI HCR140 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Human Services To Rebase The Basic Prospective Payment System Rates For Intermediate Care Facilities For Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities That Serve Medicaid Recipients To Be Effective July 1, 2015, And The Director Of Health To Include Sufficient Funding To Cover Any Increase In Basic Payment System Rates Resulting From Rebasing In Its 2015-2017 Biennium Budget.
Title
Medicaid; Intermediate Care Facilities for Individuals with Intellectual Disabilities; Prospective Payment System
Sponsors
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] |
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-23-14. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3504) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-14 10:45AM in conference room 211. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 473). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1463-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Kobayashi, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1237-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-21 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro. |
2014-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=140&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR140_.HTM |