HI HCR132 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to EGH/AGL/TEC.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to EGH/AGL/TEC.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Week Of October 6 Through 13, 2013, As "hawaii Fishing And Seafood Week".
Title
Hawaii Fishing and Seafood Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to EGH/AGL/TEC. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 678). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1658), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-01 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, McKelvey excused (2). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1283), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-27-13 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR102 (Same As) 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=132&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR132_.HTM |