HI HCR13 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR13
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Develop And Implement An Affirmative Action Program To Recruit And Employ Qualified Blind Professionals To Serve As Orientation And Mobility Instructors And In Other Positions As Teachers Of Visually Impaired Students.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Develop And Implement An Affirmative Action Program To Recruit And Employ Qualified Blind Professionals To Serve As Orientation And Mobility Instructors And In Other Positions As Teachers Of Visually Impaired Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1608-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ohno. |
2022-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2022-02-23 | House | Offered |
2022-02-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR11 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
HCR13 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 15
SCR1 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR13 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 15
SCR1 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.