HI HCR13 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Name The New Central Oahu Ambulance Facility After The Late Loretta Fuddy, Director Of Health.
Title
Central Oahu Ambulance Facility; Loretta Fuddy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to PBS, referral sheet 9 |
2014-01-21 | House | Offered |
2014-01-17 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR8 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 9
SCR8 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 50
SCR8 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 50
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=13&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HCR13_.HTM |