HI HR8 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Name The New Central Oahu Ambulance Facility After The Late Loretta Fuddy, Director Of Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central Oahu Ambulance Facility; Loretta Fuddy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-29HouseReferred to PBS, referral sheet 9
2014-01-21HouseOffered
2014-01-17HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR13 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 9
SR7 (Same As) 2014-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback