HI HCR125 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Faculty Of The University Of Hawaii System To Make Greater Use Of Open Education Resources And Other Low-cost Or Free Resources.
Title
Encouraging The Faculty Of The University Of Hawaii System To Make Greater Use Of Open Education Resources And Other Low-cost Or Free Resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1696-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan. |
2018-03-21 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-18 at 2:00 PM. |
2018-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR112 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR125 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 704) in amended form (SD 1).
HCR125 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 704) in amended form (SD 1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=125&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR125_.HTM |