HI HCR120 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Conduct A Study Of The Commercial Vessel Permits In State Small Boat Harbors Involving Ocean-related Activities For Ocean Waters Between Kalaeloa Point And Kaena Point, Consult With The Waianae Coast Community On The Existing And Future Ocean-use Activities.
Title
Department of Land and Natural Resources; Kaena Point; Kalaeloa Point; Small Boat Harbors; Commercial Permits
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2013-04-24 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 727) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1608) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-13 9:45AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 388). |
2013-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1315), recommending adoption. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Coffman; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Cullen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Monday, 03-25-13 8:45AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
2013-03-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR91 (Same As) 2013-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=120&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR120_.HTM |