HI HCR12 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR12
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kahala, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Existing Seawall And Steps, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kahala, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Existing Seawall And Steps, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2018-01-24 | House | Offered |
2018-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR19 (Same As) 2018-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR12 (Carry Over) 2017-03-31 - Re-Referred to TRE.
HCR12 (Carry Over) 2017-03-31 - Re-Referred to TRE.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=12&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR12_.HTM |