HI HCR118 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Adopt And Implement New Administrative Rules To Prohibit A Beneficiary From Applying For A Hawaiian Home Lands Lease If The Person Already Received A Lease Award And Sold, Unless There Are Compelling Or Persuasive Reasons For Selling The Lease.
Title
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands; Rules; Lease Awards
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Jon Karamatsu [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-17-10 10:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, JUD, referral sheet 50 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HAW/JUD, referral sheet 32 | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Offered | |
2010-02-23 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR66 (Same As) 2010-03-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=118&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HCR118_.HTM |