HI HCR114 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR114

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/LHE, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The University Of Hawaii At Manoa John A. Burns School Of Medicine To Conduct A Study That Investigates The Prevalence Of The Rs-12252-c Variation Of The Ifitm3 Gene Among Hawaii Residents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The University Of Hawaii At Manoa John A. Burns School Of Medicine To Conduct A Study That Investigates The Prevalence Of The Rs-12252-c Variation Of The Ifitm3 Gene Among Hawaii Residents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred to HLT/LHE, CPC, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered
2020-03-05HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR95 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/LHE, CPC, referral sheet 40
HCR114 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback