HI HCR112 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing The Amendment Of A Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Piers 24 To 26, Identified As "lot 12", In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, For Pacific Shipyards International.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Amendment Of A Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Piers 24 To 26, Identified As "lot 12", In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, For Pacific Shipyards International.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 928).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-22SenateReported from WTL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2227) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-17SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella.
2019-04-17SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Riviere.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to WTL/WAM.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 615).
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2010), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1850), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen.
2019-03-22HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback