HI HCR103 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR103
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations Conduct A Study And Survey Relating To Gender Representation On The Boards Of Public And Private For-profit And Nonprofit Corporations In The State.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations Conduct A Study And Survey Relating To Gender Representation On The Boards Of Public And Private For-profit And Nonprofit Corporations In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR84 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 40
HCR103 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR103 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=103&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR103_.HTM |