HI HCR100 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) Referred to TIA/PGM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - (S) Referred to TIA/PGM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Prohibit Parking On Date Street Between Kapiolani Boulevard And Laau Street During The Morning Hours To Alleviate Traffic Congestion.
Title
Requesting the City and County of Honolulu to prohibit parking on Date Street between Kapiolani Boulevard and La'au Street during certain hours.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | (S) Referred to TIA/PGM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 335). | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Manahan excused (2). | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1348-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, Yamashita, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Johanson. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to TRN, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-12 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR72 (Same As) 2012-03-28 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.