HI HB998 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act 042, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act 042, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the prohibition of private fees for a future transfer of real property.
Title
Real Property; Private Transfer Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Act 042, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142). |
2013-04-24 | House | Act 042, on 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142). |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 460). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1327) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 10:05AM in conference room 16. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 860) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 118). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 641), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Cabanilla, Ito, Wooley, Thielen. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cabanilla, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Carroll, Har, Ito, Thielen. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 02-11-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-04-13 10:50AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB503 (Same As) 2013-04-11 - Senate disagrees with House amendments.