HI HB987 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB987
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Act 037, on 06/15/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Act 037, on 06/15/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the hearing and vision program statute to increase the early identification of children with hearing or vision loss, by establishing consistent protocols for hearing and vision screening and follow-up, screener training, and data collection for quality improvement. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Hearing And Vision Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Act 037, on 06/15/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137). |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Act 037, 06/15/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 822). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-29 | House | Deferred one day 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2022-04-28 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 807). |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 883). |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Tam Co-Chairs; Har, B. Kobayashi, Ward. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 750) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3902) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee on JDC/WAM has rescheduled its decision making to 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1162) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 148). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 804), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 418) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1141 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24
HB987 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
HB987 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.