HI HB978 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 045, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 045, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers certain duties from the administrator of the State Procurement Office to the heads of health and human services purchasing agencies. Changes the small purchase threshold for health and human services. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Purchases Of Health And Human Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Act 045, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145). |
2023-06-01 | House | Act 045, on 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145). |
2023-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 64). |
2023-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 64) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Moriwaki, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Sayama, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; San Buenaventura, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Aquino, Awa. |
2023-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 971). |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Sayama, Garrett Co-Chairs; Hussey-Burdick, Alcos. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 802) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1872) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported from GVO/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HHS, WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 370). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-02-16 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1276 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to GVO/HHS, WAM.