HI HB974 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB974
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a program specialist position within the Department of Agriculture and appropriates moneys to fund the position. Requires the grant specialist to prioritize assistance for farmers and ranchers who produce local food, at least some portion of which is consumed within the State. Effective 6/30/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457). |
2024-03-22 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309 |
2023-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-28-23 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 867). |
2023-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Kahaloa Co-Chairs; Cochran, Poepoe, Ward. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Aquino Co-Chair; Richards. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 800) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1871) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1193) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-17-23 1:05PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-23 1:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 368). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1156), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2023-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-23 10:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB974 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309
SB1272 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1272 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.