HI HB971 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the sunset of the Transient Accommodations Tax rate of 9.25 per cent and raises the rate to 11.25 per cent beginning July 1, 2013, and also eliminates the sunset date for the amounts to be distributed to the tourism special fund and the counties.
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 02-11-13 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1202 (Same As) 2013-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=971&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB971_.htm |