HI HB969 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies the Department of Taxation's current unauthorized inspection policies and procedures, which were adopted in conformance with the prohibitions of the Taxpayer Browsing Protection Act of 1997 and Internal Revenue Code section 7123A, including criminal penalty provisions.
Title
Taxation; Unauthorized Inspection of Tax Returns and Tax Return Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-19 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-21-13 4:00PM in conference room 308. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1200 (Same As) 2013-02-11 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=969&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB969_.htm |