HI HB968 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB968
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies requirements on the County Boards of Water Supply. Adds representation on the County Boards of Water Supply of the interests to be served by the allocation of water for current and foreseeable development and use of Hawaiian Home Lands as set forth in section 221 of the Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Title
Relating To The County Boards Of Water Supply.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1122 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB968 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB968 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=968&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB968_.HTM |