HI HB965 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB965
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the governor and the mayors to establish lesser petty misdemeanor offenses and violations during emergency periods, including non-criminal infractions; and establishes a more expeditious system for the processing of these infractions to reduce the burden on the court system.
Title
Relating To The Violation Of Rules During Emergency Periods.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1119 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB965 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB965 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=965&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB965_.HTM |