HI HB958 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB958

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the minimum eligibility requirements for appointment to the position of adjutant general. Effective 7/1/3050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Defense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-02-09HouseReported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 63) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-03HouseThe committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-03-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1112 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB958 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback