HI HB957 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Act 057, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Act 057, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Education to borrow moneys interest-free from the Hawaii Green Infrastructure Loan Program for heat abatement measures at public schools. Requires the Department of Education to make payments on the loan from revenues saved by energy efficiency measures. (HB957 CD1)
Title
Relating To Heat Abatement.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Act 057, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157). |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Act 057, 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 144). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 144) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Woodson, Luke, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Tupola. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting rescheduled for 04-28-17 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 2:10PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 589). |
2017-04-20 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Cullen added as Conferee. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Inouye, Tokuda Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Woodson, Luke Co-Chairs; Har, Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 623) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1517) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EDU/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1136) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EDU/TRE, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 166). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 867), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ohno, Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 194) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-17 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-17 at 11:00AM. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |