HI HB956 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB956
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all places of public accommodation constructed or substantially modified after June 30, 2017 to provide baby diaper-changing accommodations that are equally accessible to men and women.
Title
Relating To Gender Equity.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB956 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=956&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB956_.HTM |