HI HB949 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB949
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates funds for a solar energy storage system loan program to provide asset limited, income constrained, employed households with low-interest loans to purchase and install solar energy storage systems. Establishes and appropriates funds for a renewable energy system installation loan program to provide asset limited, income constrained, employed households with low-interest loans to purchase and install residential photovoltaic and energy storage systems, including battery storage systems. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EET/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1321) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPN, WAM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 187). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1004), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 234) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2023-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB949 (Carry Over) 2023-04-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Energy Storage Systems
Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority
Loan Program
Renewable Energy
Residential Photovoltaic
Revolving Loan Fund
Energy Storage Systems
Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority
Loan Program
Renewable Energy
Residential Photovoltaic
Revolving Loan Fund