HI HB943 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Act 105, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Act 105, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisions concerning nondepository trust companies, including powers and duties, yearly assessment calculations, and paid-in-capital and surplus requirements. Appropriates funds to the division of financial institutions to administer nondepository trusts. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Nondepository Trusts.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | Act 105, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Act 105, 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 9). |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 9) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809). |
2021-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-19-21 1:30PM in conference room CR 229. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Chang. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Kong, Matsumoto. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 495). |
2021-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 633) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-21. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1536) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1019) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 21). |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 370) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1097 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Subjects
Agent
Appropriation ($)
Assessments
Fees
Financial Institutions
Nondepository Trust Companies
Paid-in-capital
Powers and Duties
Surplus
Appropriation ($)
Assessments
Fees
Financial Institutions
Nondepository Trust Companies
Paid-in-capital
Powers and Duties
Surplus