HI HB941 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Act 004, 4/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Act 004, 4/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the composition of the Natural Area Reserves System Commission by adding a member possessing a background in native Hawaiian traditional and customary practices, and removing the Superintendent of Education as a member.
Title
Natural Area Reserves System Commission; Membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Act 004, 4/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104). |
2013-04-03 | House | Act 004, on 4/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104). |
2013-03-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-03-18 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 399). |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Taniguchi). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-18-13. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 877) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Hee, Slom. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL/THA. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 14). |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 273), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-06-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2013-01-28 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 01-28-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, OMH, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1172 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-15-13 8:30AM in conference room 325.