HI HB941 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows home school students to participate in any extracurricular activities offered by a public school. Requires home school students to pay applicable activity-participation fees.
Title
Home School Students; Extracurricular Activities
Sponsors
Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-09-11 2:05PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1374 (Same As) 2011-02-11 - (S) The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=941 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB941_.HTM |