HI HB935 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the scope and practice of physician assistants in the State. Amends the Hawaii Medical Board membership to include two physician assistants. Expands bases to revoke or suspend a physician or surgeon's license. Makes conforming amendments. (HB935 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 181) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1406 (Same As) 2019-07-05 - Act 181, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback