HI HB933 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB933
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends the requirement for public employers to make annual required contributions to the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund through fiscal year 2024-2025.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1087 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB933 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB933 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Annual Required Contribution
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund
Other Post-Employment Benefits Trust (OPEB)
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund
Other Post-Employment Benefits Trust (OPEB)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=933&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB933_.HTM |